+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (29)
On July 9, 2009 in the House:
- Delivered to Secretary of State
- Approved by Governor
On May 29, 2009 in the House:
- Delivered to Governor
On May 29, 2009 in the Senate:
- Signed by President Pro Tem
On May 29, 2009 in the House:
- Signed by House Speaker
On May 5, 2009 in the House:
- Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed - AYES: 152 NOES: 5
- House Concurs - SCS ADOPTED AYES: 153 NOES: 6
On April 23, 2009 in the House:
- Reported to the House with... - SCS
On April 23, 2009 in the Senate:
- Third Read and Passed - YEAS: 34 NAYS: 0
- SCS Adopted
On April 15, 2009 in the Senate:
- SCS Reported Do Pass-Placed on 3rd Read Consent Calendar
- Executive Session Held - SCS VOTED DO PASS CONSENT
On April 8, 2009 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Held
On April 7, 2009 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Scheduled - WEDNESDAY, APRIL 8, 2009, 2:30P.M. BINGHAM GALLERY
On April 1, 2009 in the Senate:
- Second Read and Referred: Progress and Development
On March 31, 2009 in the Senate:
- Reported to the Senate and First Read
On March 30, 2009 in the House:
- Third Read and Passed - AYES: 155 NOES: 1
On March 24, 2009 in the House:
- Perfected by Consent - Pursuant to House Rules
On March 10, 2009 in the House:
- Rules - Reported Do Pass - Consent
- Rules - Voted Do Pass - Consent
- Rules - Executive Session Completed
On March 3, 2009 in the House:
- Referred: Rules - Pursuant to Rule 25
- Reported Do Pass by Consent
On March 2, 2009 in the House:
- Voted Do Pass - Consent
- Executive Session Completed
On February 25, 2009 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On January 22, 2009 in the House:
- Refer: Spec Stand Com on Pro. Registration & Licensing
On January 21, 2009 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 20, 2009 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor