+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On February 27, 2007 in the House:
- Voted Do Not Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On February 13, 2007 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On February 5, 2007 in the House:
- Referred: Local Government
On January 11, 2007 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 10, 2007 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Sponsors (14)
Type:
Primary Sponsor