+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On March 26, 2009 in the House:
- Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On March 4, 2009 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On January 29, 2009 in the House:
- Referred: Judiciary
On January 21, 2009 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 20, 2009 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Sponsors (42)
Type:
Primary Sponsor