+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On May 6, 2021 in the House:
- Placed Back on Formal Perfection Calendar
On April 20, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar
On March 4, 2021 in the House:
- Reported Do Pass - AYES: 8 NOES: 4 PRESENT: 0
On March 3, 2021 in the House:
- Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On March 1, 2021 in the House:
- Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight
- HCS Reported Do Pass - AYES: 10 NOES: 4 PRESENT: 0
On February 24, 2021 in the House:
- HCS Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On February 17, 2021 in the House:
- Action Postponed
On February 10, 2021 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On January 14, 2021 in the House:
- Referred: Downsizing State Government
On January 7, 2021 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 6, 2021 in the House:
- Read First Time
On December 4, 2020 in the House:
- Prefiled
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor