+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (26)
On May 14, 2009 in the Senate:
- Placed on Informal Calendar
On May 13, 2009 in the Senate:
- SCS Reported Do Pass
On May 7, 2009 in the Senate:
- Executive Session Held - SCS VOTED DO PASS
On May 6, 2009 in the Senate:
- Executive Session Scheduled - THURSDAY, MAY 7, 2009 UPON MORNING ADJOURNMENT SENATE COMMITTEE ROOM 1
On May 5, 2009 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Held
On April 30, 2009 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Scheduled - TUESDAY, MAY 5, 2009 1:00P.M. SENATE COMMITTEE ROOM 1
On April 27, 2009 in the Senate:
- Second Read and Referred: General Laws
On April 23, 2009 in the Senate:
- Reported to the Senate and First Read
On April 23, 2009 in the House:
- Third Read and Passed - AYES: 158 NOES: 0
- Reported Do Pass
- Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On April 22, 2009 in the House:
- Referred: Fiscal Review
On April 21, 2009 in the House:
- Perfected with Amendments - HA 1, HA 4, HA 5, ADOPTED
- HCS Adopted
On April 7, 2009 in the House:
- Rules - Reported Do Pass
- Rules - Voted Do Pass
- Rules - Executive Session Completed
On February 25, 2009 in the House:
- Referred: Rules - Pursuant to Rule 25
- HCS Reported Do Pass
On February 24, 2009 in the House:
- HCS Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On February 10, 2009 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On January 29, 2009 in the House:
- Referred: Special Standing Committee on General Laws
On January 20, 2009 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 15, 2009 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Sponsors (19)
Type:
Primary Sponsor