+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (27)
On July 5, 2011 in the House:
- Delivered to Secretary of State
- Approved by Governor
On May 26, 2011 in the House:
- Delivered to Governor
On May 26, 2011 in the Senate:
- Signed by President Pro Tem
On May 26, 2011 in the House:
- Signed by House Speaker
On May 2, 2011 in the Senate:
- Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed - YEAS: 31 NAYS: 0
On April 27, 2011 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass
On April 19, 2011 in the Senate:
- Executive Session Held - VOTED DO PASS
- Public Hearing Held
On April 14, 2011 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Scheduled - TUESDAY, APRIL 19, 2011, 1:30PM, SENATE COMMITTEE ROOM 1
On March 31, 2011 in the Senate:
- Second Read and Referred: General Laws
On March 16, 2011 in the Senate:
- Reported to the Senate and First Read
On March 16, 2011 in the House:
- Third Read and Passed - AYES: 151 NOES: 1
On March 14, 2011 in the House:
- Perfected by Consent - Pursuant to House Rules
On March 3, 2011 in the House:
- Rules - Reported Do Pass - Consent
- Rules - Voted Do Pass - Consent
- Rules - Executive Session Completed
On February 28, 2011 in the House:
- Rules - No Action Taken
- Rules - Executive Session Completed
On February 21, 2011 in the House:
- Referred: Rules - Pursuant to Rule 25
- HCS Reported Do Pass by Consent
On February 17, 2011 in the House:
- HCS Voted Do Pass - Consent
- Executive Session Completed
On February 7, 2011 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On January 27, 2011 in the House:
- Referred: Downsizing State Government
On January 26, 2011 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 25, 2011 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Sponsors (50)
Type:
Primary Sponsor