+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (8)
On April 8, 2013 in the House:
- Referred: Rules
- HCS Reported Do Pass
On March 27, 2013 in the House:
- HCS Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On February 13, 2013 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On January 31, 2013 in the House:
- Referred: Professional Registration and Licensing
On January 28, 2013 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 24, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Sponsors (32)
Type:
Primary Sponsor