+ − Summaries (6)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (31)
On July 8, 2011 in the House:
- Approved by Governor
- Delivered to Secretary of State
On May 26, 2011 in the House:
- Delivered to Governor
On May 26, 2011 in the Senate:
- Signed by President Pro Tem
On May 26, 2011 in the House:
- Signed by House Speaker
On May 10, 2011 in the House:
- House Concurs - SCS ADOPTED AYES: 132 NOES: 19
- Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed - AYES: 130 NOES: 19
On April 19, 2011 in the House:
- Reported to the House with... - SCS
On April 19, 2011 in the Senate:
- Placed on Informal Calendar
- Taken Up for Third Reading
- SCS Adopted
- Third Read and Passed - YEAS: 31 NAYS: 1
On April 14, 2011 in the Senate:
- SCS Reported Do Pass
On April 13, 2011 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Held
- Executive Session Held - SCS VOTED DO PASS
On April 7, 2011 in the Senate:
- Second Read and Referred: Transportation
- Public Hearing Scheduled - APRIL 13, 2011, 8:00AM, SCR 1
On April 5, 2011 in the Senate:
- Reported to the Senate and First Read
On April 5, 2011 in the House:
- Third Read and Passed - AYES: 133 NOES: 18
On April 4, 2011 in the House:
- Perfected by Consent - Pursuant to House Rules
On March 28, 2011 in the House:
- Rules - Executive Session Completed
- Rules - Voted Do Pass - Consent
- Rules - Reported Do Pass - Consent
On March 10, 2011 in the House:
- Reported Do Pass by Consent
- Referred: Rules - Pursuant to Rule 25
On March 8, 2011 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
- Executive Session Completed
- Voted Do Pass - Consent
On February 10, 2011 in the House:
- Referred: Transportation
On January 26, 2011 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 25, 2011 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor