+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On April 14, 2011 in the House:
- Third Read and Passed - AYES: 144 NOES: 11 PRESENT: 2
- Laid Over - EMERGENCY CLAUSE PENDING
On April 12, 2011 in the House:
- Perfected with Amendments - HA 2 ADOPTED
On April 7, 2011 in the House:
- Rules - Reported Do Pass
On April 6, 2011 in the House:
- Rules - Executive Session Completed
- Rules - Voted Do Pass
On March 16, 2011 in the House:
- Reported Do Pass
- Referred: Rules - Pursuant to Rule 25
On March 3, 2011 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
- Executive Session Completed
- Voted Do Pass
On February 10, 2011 in the House:
- Referred: Retirement
On January 26, 2011 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 25, 2011 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor