+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On March 12, 2009 in the House:
- Motion to Do Pass Failed
- Executive Session Completed
On March 10, 2009 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On March 2, 2009 in the House:
- Referred: Healthcare Transformation
On January 20, 2009 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 15, 2009 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Sponsors (80)
Type:
Primary Sponsor