+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (36)
On May 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- SCS Reported Do Pass
On May 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- SCS Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Held
- Public Hearing Held
- SCS Voted Do Pass
On April 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Scheduled - Wednesday, May 1, 2019, 9:00am, Senate Lounge
On April 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Second read and referred: Professional Registration
On April 15, 2019 in the House:
- Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
- Third Read and Passed
- Reported Do Pass - AYES: 7 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
- Taken Up
On April 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported to the Senate and First Read
On April 11, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on the Informal Third Reading Calendar
On April 10, 2019 in the House:
- Referred: Fiscal Review
On April 9, 2019 in the House:
- Taken Up
- Title of Bill - Agreed To
- Motion to Reconsider Adopted - Titling of Bill
- Title of Bill - Agreed To
- HCS Adopted
- Perfected with Amendments - HA 1, HA 2 adopted
On April 8, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar
On April 2, 2019 in the House:
- Reported Do Pass - AYES: 6 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
On April 1, 2019 in the House:
- Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On March 13, 2019 in the House:
- Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight
- HCS Reported Do Pass - AYES: 12 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
On March 11, 2019 in the House:
- HCS Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On March 5, 2019 in the House:
- Action Postponed
- Executive Session Continued
On February 26, 2019 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On February 7, 2019 in the House:
- Referred: Professional Registration and Licensing
On January 10, 2019 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 9, 2019 in the House:
- Read First Time
On December 18, 2018 in the House:
- Prefiled
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor