+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On April 1, 2015 in the House:
- Referred: Select Committee on Judiciary
- Reported Do Pass with Amendments - HCA 1 AYES: 12 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
On March 31, 2015 in the House:
- Voted Do Pass with Amendments
- Executive Session Completed
On February 10, 2015 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On January 27, 2015 in the House:
- Referred: Consumer Affairs
On January 8, 2015 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 7, 2015 in the House:
- Read First Time
On December 23, 2014 in the House:
- Prefiled
+ − Amendment
1017L01.01L
Distributed
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor