+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On March 5, 2009 in the House:
- HCS Reported Do Pass
On March 4, 2009 in the House:
- HCS Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On February 18, 2009 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On February 12, 2009 in the House:
- Referred: Health Care Policy
On January 20, 2009 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 15, 2009 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor