+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On March 28, 2013 in the House:
- HCS Reported Do Pass
On February 28, 2013 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On January 31, 2013 in the House:
- Referred: Downsizing State Government
On January 24, 2013 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 23, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Sponsors (23)
Type:
Primary Sponsor