+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (20)
On May 11, 2017 in the Senate:
- Second read and referred: Senate Transportation, Infrastructure, and Public Safety
On April 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported to the Senate and First Read
On April 24, 2017 in the House:
- Third Read and Passed - AYES: 103 NOES: 46 PRESENT: 1
- Taken Up
On April 18, 2017 in the House:
- Perfected with Amendments - HA 1 adopted
- HCS Adopted
- Title of Bill - Agreed To
- Taken Up
On March 28, 2017 in the House:
- Reported Do Pass - AYES: 12 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
On March 27, 2017 in the House:
- Executive Session Completed
- Voted Do Pass
On March 15, 2017 in the House:
- Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight
- HCS Reported Do Pass - AYES: 9 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0
On March 14, 2017 in the House:
- HCS Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On February 28, 2017 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On February 14, 2017 in the House:
- Referred: Crime Prevention and Public Safety
On January 5, 2017 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 4, 2017 in the House:
- Read First Time
On December 20, 2016 in the House:
- Prefiled
+ − Amendment
0933H02.02H
Adopted
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor