+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On April 30, 2015 in the House:
- Reported Do Pass - AYES: 10 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
On April 29, 2015 in the House:
- Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On April 2, 2015 in the House:
- Referred: Select Committee on Judiciary
- Reported Do Pass - AYES: 8 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
On April 1, 2015 in the House:
- Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On March 18, 2015 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On January 27, 2015 in the House:
- Referred: Civil and Criminal Proceedings
On January 8, 2015 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 7, 2015 in the House:
- Read First Time
On December 23, 2014 in the House:
- Prefiled
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor