+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On February 19, 2013 in the House:
- HCS Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On February 5, 2013 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On January 31, 2013 in the House:
- Referred: Children, Families, and Persons with Disabilities
On January 24, 2013 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 23, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor