+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (16)
On March 3, 2021 in the House:
- Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight
- HCS#2 Reported Do Pass - AYES: 13 NOES: 5 PRESENT: 0
On March 2, 2021 in the House:
- HCS#2 Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On February 11, 2021 in the House:
- Returned to Committee of Origin - Small Business AYES: 9 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
- Voted to Return to the Committee of Origin
- Executive Session Completed
On February 3, 2021 in the House:
- Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight
- HCS Reported Do Pass - AYES: 12 NOES: 5 PRESENT: 0
On February 2, 2021 in the House:
- HCS Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On January 26, 2021 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On January 14, 2021 in the House:
- Referred: Special Committee on Small Business
On January 7, 2021 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 6, 2021 in the House:
- Read First Time
On December 1, 2020 in the House:
- Prefiled
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor