+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (41)
On September 11, 2013 in the House:
- Delivered to Secretary of State
On September 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Votes to Override Veto - AYES: 26 NOES: 8
- Senate Votes to Override Veto - AYES: 26 NOES: 8
- Senate Message
- Senate Message
On September 11, 2013 in the House:
- House Votes to Override Veto - AYES: 114 NOES: 45
- House Votes to Override Veto - AYES: 114 NOES: 45
- House Message
- House Message
On July 1, 2013 in the House:
- Vetoed by Governor
- Vetoed by Governor
- Delivered to Secretary of State
- Delivered to Secretary of State
On May 22, 2013 in the House:
- Delivered to Governor
On May 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by President Pro Tem
On May 22, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by House Speaker
On May 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Taken Up for Third Reading
- Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed - AYES: 28 NOES: 2
On May 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on Informal Calendar
On May 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass
On April 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Held
- Executive Session Held - Voted Do Pass
On April 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Scheduled - TUESDAY, APRIL 16, 2013, 1:30PM,SCR1
On April 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Second read and referred: Senate General Laws
On April 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported to the Senate and First Read
On April 2, 2013 in the House:
- Taken Up for Third Reading
- Third Read and Passed - AYES: 114 NOES: 32
On March 28, 2013 in the House:
- Perfected by Consent - Pursuant to House Rules
On March 14, 2013 in the House:
- Rules - Executive Session Completed
- Rules - Voted Do Pass - Consent
- Rules - Reported Do Pass - Consent
On March 13, 2013 in the House:
- Reported Do Pass by Consent
- Referred: Rules
On March 7, 2013 in the House:
- Executive Session Completed
- Voted Do Pass - Consent
On February 14, 2013 in the House:
- Executive Session Completed
- Voted Do Pass
On February 7, 2013 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On January 31, 2013 in the House:
- Referred: Downsizing State Government
On January 24, 2013 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 23, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Sponsors (13)
Type:
Primary Sponsor