+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (19)
On March 17, 2011 in the Senate:
- Second Read and Referred: Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence
On March 7, 2011 in the Senate:
- Reported to the Senate and First Read
On March 3, 2011 in the House:
- Third Read and Passed - AYES: 142 NOES: 15
On March 1, 2011 in the House:
- Perfected with Amendments - HA 1 TO HA 1, HA 1 AS AMENDED, HA 2 ADOPTED
- HCS Adopted
- Taken Up for Perfection
On February 28, 2011 in the House:
- Laid Over - HA 1 TO HA 1, HA 1 AS AMENDED, HA 2 ADOPTED
- Taken Up for Perfection
On February 21, 2011 in the House:
- Rules - Executive Session Completed
- Rules - Voted Do Pass
- Rules - Reported Do Pass
On February 16, 2011 in the House:
- Referred: Rules - Pursuant to Rule 25
- HCS Reported Do Pass
On February 15, 2011 in the House:
- HCS Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On February 8, 2011 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On January 27, 2011 in the House:
- Referred: General Laws
On January 24, 2011 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 20, 2011 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Sponsors (13)
Type:
Primary Sponsor