+ − Actions (28)
On May 11, 2001 in the House:
- Delivered to Secretary of State
- Approved by Governor
On May 1, 2001 in the House:
- Delivered to Governor
On May 1, 2001 in the Senate:
- Signed by President Pro Tem
On May 1, 2001 in the House:
- Signed by House Speaker
- Bill Typed as Truly Agreed
On April 26, 2001 in the House:
- Emergency Clause Adopted on Truly Agreed to Bill
- Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed - AYES: 122 NOES: 004
- House Concurs - SA 1 TO SCA 1 AND SCA 1 AS AMENDED ADOPTED
On April 25, 2001 in the House:
- Reported to the House with... - AMENDMENTS
On April 25, 2001 in the Senate:
- Emergency Clause Adopted
- Third Read and Passed with Amendments - SA 1 TO SCA 1, SCA 1 AS AMENDED ADOPTED YEAS: 20 NAYS: 12
On April 12, 2001 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass with Amendments - SCA 1
- Executive Session Held
On April 11, 2001 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Held
On April 5, 2001 in the Senate:
- Second Read and Referred: Education
On April 4, 2001 in the Senate:
- Reported to the Senate and First Read
On April 4, 2001 in the House:
- Emergency Clause Adopted
- Third Read and Passed - AYES: 144 NOES: 004
On March 28, 2001 in the House:
- Reported Perfected and Printed
On March 27, 2001 in the House:
- Perfected
- HCS Adopted
On March 15, 2001 in the House:
- HCS Reported Do Pass
On March 7, 2001 in the House:
- Executive Session Completed - VOTED DO PASS
On February 28, 2001 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On January 29, 2001 in the House:
- Referred: Education-Elementary and Secondary
On January 7, 2001 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 4, 2001 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor