+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (29)
On July 13, 2009 in the House:
- Delivered to Secretary of State
- Approved by Governor
On May 29, 2009 in the House:
- Delivered to Governor
On May 29, 2009 in the Senate:
- Signed by President Pro Tem
On May 29, 2009 in the House:
- Signed by House Speaker
On May 5, 2009 in the House:
- Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed - AYES: 151 NOES: 7
- House Concurs - SCS ADOPTED AYES: 151 NOES: 5
On April 22, 2009 in the House:
- Reported to the House with... - SCS
On April 22, 2009 in the Senate:
- Third Read and Passed - YEAS: 32 NAYS: 0
- SCS Adopted
On April 15, 2009 in the Senate:
- SCS Reported Do Pass-Placed on 3rd Read Consent Calendar
On April 14, 2009 in the Senate:
- Executive Session Held - SCS VOTED DO PASS CONSENT
- Public Hearing Held
On April 9, 2009 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Scheduled - TUESDAY, APRIL 14, 2009 6:00P.M. OR UPON EVENING RECESS SENATE COMMITTEE ROOM 1
On April 2, 2009 in the Senate:
- Second Read and Referred: Health, Mental Health, Seniors, and Families
On April 1, 2009 in the Senate:
- Reported to the Senate and First Read
On April 1, 2009 in the House:
- Third Read and Passed - AYES: 158 NOES: 1
On March 31, 2009 in the House:
- Perfected by Consent - Pursuant to House Rules
On March 24, 2009 in the House:
- Rules - Reported Do Pass - Consent
- Rules - Voted Do Pass - Consent
- Rules - Executive Session Completed
On March 10, 2009 in the House:
- Referred: Rules - Pursuant to Rule 25
- HCS Reported Do Pass by Consent
- HCS Voted Do Pass - Consent
- Executive Session Completed
On February 25, 2009 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On January 22, 2009 in the House:
- Referred: Health Care Policy
On January 15, 2009 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 14, 2009 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Sponsors (19)
Type:
Primary Sponsor