+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (24)
On April 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass
On April 12, 2017 in the Senate:
- Executive Session Held - Voted do pass
On April 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Held
On March 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Scheduled - Wednesday, April 5, 2017, 8:00am, Senate Lounge
On March 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Second read and referred: Senate Seniors, Families, and Children
On March 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported to the Senate and First Read
On March 16, 2017 in the House:
- Third Read and Passed - AYES: 139 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0
- Taken Up
On March 14, 2017 in the House:
- Perfected with Amendments - HA 1 adopted
- HCS Adopted
- Title of Bill - Agreed To - relating to marriage licenses
- Taken Up
On March 1, 2017 in the House:
- Executive Session Completed
- Reported Do Pass - AYES: 11 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
- Voted Do Pass
On February 15, 2017 in the House:
- Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight
- HCS Reported Do Pass - AYES: 11 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
On February 14, 2017 in the House:
- HCS Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On February 7, 2017 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On January 19, 2017 in the House:
- Referred: Children and Families
On January 5, 2017 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 4, 2017 in the House:
- Read First Time
On December 19, 2016 in the House:
- Prefiled
+ − Amendments (11)
0854H03.21H
Distributed
0854H03.22H
Adopted
0854H03.19H
Distributed
0854H03.15H
Distributed
0854H03.13H
Distributed
0854H03.12H
Distributed
0854H03.05H
Distributed
0854H03.06H
Distributed
0854H03.09H
Distributed
0854H03.04H
Distributed
0854H03.03H
Distributed
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor