+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (14)
On May 9, 2022 in the House:
- Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar
On May 2, 2022 in the House:
- Placed Back on Formal Perfection Calendar
On April 12, 2022 in the House:
- Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar
On March 31, 2022 in the House:
- Reported Do Pass - AYES: 7 NOES: 4 PRESENT: 0
- Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On March 3, 2022 in the House:
- Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight
- Reported Do Pass - AYES: 8 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0
On March 2, 2022 in the House:
- Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On February 23, 2022 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On February 16, 2022 in the House:
- Referred: Special Committee on Tourism
On February 14, 2022 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On February 10, 2022 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor