+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (19)
On April 27, 2016 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Held
On April 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Scheduled - Wednesday, April 27, 2016, 8:15am, SCR 1
- Second read and referred: Senate Transportation, Infrastructure, and Public Safety
On April 14, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reported to the Senate and First Read
On April 14, 2016 in the House:
- Third Read and Passed - AYES: * NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0
- Taken Up
On April 12, 2016 in the House:
- Perfected with Amendments - HA 1 adopted
- Taken Up
On April 7, 2016 in the House:
- Reported Do Pass - AYES: 9 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
On March 31, 2016 in the House:
- Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On March 15, 2016 in the House:
- Referred: Select Committee on State and Local Governments
- Reported Do Pass - AYES: 6 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
- Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
- Public Hearing Completed
On March 10, 2016 in the House:
- Referred: Local Government
On March 3, 2016 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On March 2, 2016 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Amendment
6728H02.01H
Adopted
+ − Vote
April 14, 2016: HB 2667
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor