+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On April 20, 2016 in the House:
- Referred: Select Committee on State and Local Governments
- Reported Do Pass with Amendments - HCA 1 to HCA 1 and HCA 1 as amended AYES: 8 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
On April 19, 2016 in the House:
- Voted Do Pass with Amendments
- Executive Session Completed
On April 5, 2016 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On March 16, 2016 in the House:
- Referred: Local Government
On March 3, 2016 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On March 2, 2016 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Amendments (2)
6735H01.02H
Committee
6735H01.01H
Committee
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor