+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (20)
On April 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Second read and referred: General Laws
On April 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported to the Senate and First Read
On April 8, 2019 in the House:
- Third Read and Passed - AYES: 126 NOES: 18 PRESENT: 3
- Taken Up
On April 2, 2019 in the House:
- Perfected
- Title of Bill - Agreed To
- Taken Up
- Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar
On March 27, 2019 in the House:
- Reported Do Pass - AYES: 8 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
On March 26, 2019 in the House:
- Executive Session Completed
- Voted Do Pass
On February 13, 2019 in the House:
- Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight
- Reported Do Pass - AYES: 5 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
- Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On February 6, 2019 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On January 17, 2019 in the House:
- Referred: Special Committee on Small Business
On January 10, 2019 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 9, 2019 in the House:
- Read First Time
On December 14, 2018 in the House:
- Prefiled
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor