+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (22)
On May 4, 2022 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Held
On May 2, 2022 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Scheduled - Wednesday, May 4, 2022, 9:00 a.m. to 10:00 a.m, Senate Committee Room 1.
On April 21, 2022 in the Senate:
- Second read and referred: Seniors, Families, Veterans and Military Affairs
On April 19, 2022 in the Senate:
- Reported to the Senate and First Read
On April 19, 2022 in the House:
- Emergency Clause Adopted - AYES: 133 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 0
- Third Read and Passed - AYES: 134 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
- Taken Up for Third Reading
On April 13, 2022 in the House:
- Perfected
- Title of Bill - Agreed To
- Taken Up for Perfection
On April 4, 2022 in the House:
- Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar
On March 24, 2022 in the House:
- Executive Session Completed
- Reported Do Pass - AYES: 10 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
- Voted Do Pass
On February 28, 2022 in the House:
- Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight
- Reported Do Pass - AYES: 9 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
- Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On February 22, 2022 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On February 10, 2022 in the House:
- Referred: Workforce Development
On February 6, 2022 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On February 1, 2022 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor