+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (21)
On April 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Second read and referred: Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy and the Environment
On April 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reported to the Senate and First Read
On April 19, 2021 in the House:
- Third Read and Passed - AYES: 107 NOES: 46 PRESENT: 0
- Taken Up for Third Reading
On April 15, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on the Informal Third Reading Calendar
On April 13, 2021 in the House:
- Perfected
- Title of Bill - Agreed To
- Taken Up for Perfection
On March 31, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar
On March 23, 2021 in the House:
- Executive Session Completed
- Voted Do Pass
- Reported Do Pass - AYES: 9 NOES: 4 PRESENT: 0
On March 10, 2021 in the House:
- Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight
- Reported Do Pass - AYES: 6 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 0
- Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On February 24, 2021 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On February 4, 2021 in the House:
- Referred: Utilities
On January 7, 2021 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 6, 2021 in the House:
- Read First Time
On December 1, 2020 in the House:
- Prefiled
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor