+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (27)
On April 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- SCS Reported Do Pass
- Executive Session Held - SCS voted do pass
On April 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Held
On April 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Scheduled - Wednesday, April 26, 2017, 8:00 a.m., Senate Lounge
On April 18, 2017 in the Senate:
- Second read and referred: Senate Seniors, Families, and Children
On April 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported to the Senate and First Read
On April 13, 2017 in the House:
- Emergency Clause Adopted - AYES: 136 NOES: 21 PRESENT: 0
- Third Read and Passed - AYES: 147 NOES: 9 PRESENT: 0
- Taken Up
On April 11, 2017 in the House:
- Perfected with Amendments - HA 1 adopted
- HCS Adopted
- Title of Bill - Agreed To - relating to child welfare
- Taken Up
On March 28, 2017 in the House:
- Reported Do Pass - AYES: 10 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0
On March 27, 2017 in the House:
- Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On March 1, 2017 in the House:
- Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight
- HCS Reported Do Pass - AYES: 7 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0
On February 28, 2017 in the House:
- HCS Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On February 7, 2017 in the House:
- Action Postponed
- Executive Session Continued
On January 31, 2017 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On January 12, 2017 in the House:
- Referred: Children and Families
On January 5, 2017 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 4, 2017 in the House:
- Read First Time
On December 19, 2016 in the House:
- Prefiled
+ − Amendment
0573H02.02H
Adopted