+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (23)
On May 3, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on the Informal Third Reading Calendar
On April 28, 2021 in the House:
- Title of Bill - Agreed To
- Taken Up for Perfection
- Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar
- Placed Back on Formal Perfection Calendar
- Perfected
On April 21, 2021 in the House:
- Reported Do Pass - AYES: 9 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
- Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On April 13, 2021 in the House:
- Committed to: Legislative Review
On April 12, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar
On March 11, 2021 in the House:
- Executive Session Completed
- Reported Do Pass - AYES: 14 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
- Voted Do Pass
On February 18, 2021 in the House:
- Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight
- Reported Do Pass - AYES: 11 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
On February 17, 2021 in the House:
- Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On February 10, 2021 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On January 14, 2021 in the House:
- Referred: Judiciary
On January 7, 2021 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 6, 2021 in the House:
- Read First Time
On December 1, 2020 in the House:
- Prefiled
+ − Amendment
1010H01.12H
Defeated
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor