+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On April 18, 2018 in the House:
- Reported Do Pass - AYES: 7 NOES: 4 PRESENT: 1
- Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On April 11, 2018 in the House:
- Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight
- Reported Do Pass - AYES: 7 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0
On April 10, 2018 in the House:
- Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On April 3, 2018 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On March 7, 2018 in the House:
- Referred: Children and Families
On February 28, 2018 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On February 27, 2018 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor