+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On March 27, 2007 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On March 13, 2007 in the House:
- Public Hearing Scheduled, Bill not Heard
On February 1, 2007 in the House:
- Referred: Special Committee on Urban Issues
On January 9, 2007 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 8, 2007 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor