+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (23)
On May 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on Informal Calendar
On May 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass
On April 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Executive Session Held - VOTED DO PASS
- Public Hearing Held
On April 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Scheduled - THURSDAY, APRIL 25, 2013, 8:30AM, SENATE LOUNGE
On April 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Second read and referred: Senate Veterans' Affairs and Health
On April 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported to the Senate and First Read
On April 15, 2013 in the House:
- Third Read and Passed - AYES: 149 NOES: 2
- Taken Up for Third Reading
On April 9, 2013 in the House:
- Taken Up for Perfection
- HCS Adopted
- Perfected
On March 28, 2013 in the House:
- Rules - Reported Do Pass
- Rules - Voted Do Pass
- Rules - Executive Session Completed
On March 6, 2013 in the House:
- Referred: Rules
- HCS Reported Do Pass
- HCS Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On February 20, 2013 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On January 31, 2013 in the House:
- Referred: Health Care Policy
On January 24, 2013 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 23, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time