+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (11)
On March 17, 2016 in the House:
- Executive Session Completed
- HCS Voted Do Pass
- HCS Reported Do Pass - AYES: 9 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
On March 14, 2016 in the House:
- Executive Session Completed
- Voted Do Pass
- Reported Do Pass - AYES: 10 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
- Referred: Select Committee on Education
On March 7, 2016 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On February 24, 2016 in the House:
- Referred: Emerging Issues in Education
On February 18, 2016 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On February 17, 2016 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Amendments (14)
6260H02.14H
Distributed
6260H02.18H
Distributed
6260H02.17H
Distributed
6260H02.16H
Distributed
6260H02.15H
Distributed
6260H02.11H
Distributed
6260H02.12H
Distributed
6260H02.06H
Distributed
6260H02.04H
Distributed
6260H02.10H
Distributed
6260H02.07H
Distributed
6260H02.05H
Distributed
6260H02.03H
Distributed
6260H02.02H
Distributed