+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On March 17, 2016 in the House:
- Executive Session Completed
- HCS Voted Do Pass
- HCS Reported Do Pass
On March 14, 2016 in the House:
- Executive Session Completed
- Voted Do Pass
- Reported Do Pass - AYES: 10 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
- Referred: Select Committee on Education
On March 7, 2016 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On February 24, 2016 in the House:
- Referred: Emerging Issues in Education
On February 18, 2016 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On February 17, 2016 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time