+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (14)
On May 1, 2020 in the House:
- Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar
On March 18, 2020 in the House:
- Placed Back on Formal Perfection Calendar
On March 10, 2020 in the House:
- Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar
On March 5, 2020 in the House:
- Reported Do Pass - AYES: 6 NOES: 4 PRESENT: 0
- Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On March 4, 2020 in the House:
- Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight
- Reported Do Pass - AYES: 6 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0
On March 3, 2020 in the House:
- Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On March 2, 2020 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On February 27, 2020 in the House:
- Referred: Downsizing State Government
On February 25, 2020 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On February 24, 2020 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor