+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On May 8, 2008 in the House:
- Rules - Reported Do Pass
- Rules - Voted Do Pass
- Rules - Executive Session Completed
On May 6, 2008 in the House:
- Referred: Rules Pursuant to Rule 25
- Reported Do Pass
On April 30, 2008 in the House:
- Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
- Public Hearing Completed
On April 23, 2008 in the House:
- Referred: Special Committee on Urban Issues
On April 2, 2008 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On April 1, 2008 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time