+ − Actions (18)
On June 26, 2003 in the House:
- Delivered to Secretary of State
- Approved by Governor
On May 21, 2003 in the House:
- Delivered to Governor
On May 21, 2003 in the Senate:
- Signed by President Pro Tem
On May 21, 2003 in the House:
- Signed by House Speaker
On April 28, 2003 in the Senate:
- Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed - YEAS: 33 NAYS: 0
On April 15, 2003 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass-Placed on Third Read Consent Calendar
- Executive Session Held
On April 7, 2003 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Held
On March 17, 2003 in the Senate:
- Second Read and Referred: Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence
On March 12, 2003 in the Senate:
- Reported to the Senate and First Read
On March 12, 2003 in the House:
- Third Read and Passed - AYES: 154 NOES: 0
On February 27, 2003 in the House:
- HCS Reported Do Pass by Consent
On February 19, 2003 in the House:
- Executive Session Completed - HCS VOTED DO PASS CONSENT
On February 12, 2003 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On January 27, 2003 in the House:
- Referred: Judiciary
On January 23, 2003 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 22, 2003 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor