+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (25)
On July 13, 2009 in the House:
- Delivered to Secretary of State
- Vetoed by Governor
On May 29, 2009 in the House:
- Delivered to Governor
On May 29, 2009 in the Senate:
- Signed by President Pro Tem
On May 29, 2009 in the House:
- Signed by House Speaker
On May 12, 2009 in the Senate:
- Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed - YEAS: 33 NAYS: 0
On April 9, 2009 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass-Placed on Third Read Consent Calendar
On April 8, 2009 in the Senate:
- Executive Session Held - VOTED DO PASS CONSENT
- Public Hearing Held
On April 2, 2009 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Scheduled - WEDNESDAY, APRIL 8, 2009 1:00PM OR UPON NOON RECESS SCR 1
On March 26, 2009 in the Senate:
- Second Read and Referred: Agriculture, Food Production, and Outdoor Resources
On March 12, 2009 in the House:
- Third Read and Passed - AYES: 156 NOES: 0
On March 12, 2009 in the Senate:
- Reported to the Senate and First Read
On March 10, 2009 in the House:
- Perfected by Consent - Pursuant to House Rules
On March 3, 2009 in the House:
- Rules - Reported Do Pass - Consent
- Rules - Voted Do Pass - Consent
- Rules - Executive Session Completed
On February 23, 2009 in the House:
- Referred: Rules - Pursuant to Rule 25
- HCS Reported Do Pass by Consent
On February 17, 2009 in the House:
- HCS Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On February 10, 2009 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On February 5, 2009 in the House:
- Refer: Spec Stand Com on Emerging Issues in Animal Agri
On January 14, 2009 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 13, 2009 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor