+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (9)
On April 1, 2021 in the House:
- Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight
- HCS Reported Do Pass - AYES: 9 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
On March 31, 2021 in the House:
- HCS Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On March 24, 2021 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On March 8, 2021 in the House:
- Referred: Judiciary
On January 7, 2021 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 6, 2021 in the House:
- Read First Time
On December 1, 2020 in the House:
- Prefiled
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor