+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (34)
On April 27, 2022 in the Senate:
- Placed on Informal Calendar - SA 1 to SA 1, SA 1, SS, pending.
- SS Offered
- Taken Up for Third Reading
On April 25, 2022 in the Senate:
- Placed on Informal Calendar
- Reported Do Pass
- Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Held
On April 21, 2022 in the Senate:
- Executive Session Scheduled - Monday, April 25, 2022, 3:30 p.m., Senate Lounge.
- Referred: Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight
On April 20, 2022 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass
On April 19, 2022 in the Senate:
- Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Held
On April 6, 2022 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Held
On April 1, 2022 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Scheduled - Wednesday, April 6, 2022, 8:30 a.m., Senate Committee Room 2.
On March 31, 2022 in the Senate:
- Second read and referred: Appropriations
On March 24, 2022 in the House:
- Taken Up for Third Reading
- Third Read and Passed - AYES: 115 NOES: 33 PRESENT: 0
On March 24, 2022 in the Senate:
- Reported to the Senate and First Read
On March 23, 2022 in the House:
- Perfected with Amendments - HSA 1 for HA 1, HA 2, adopted.
- HCS Adopted
- Title of Bill - Agreed To
- Taken Up for Perfection
On March 10, 2022 in the House:
- Reported Do Pass - AYES: 13 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0
On March 8, 2022 in the House:
- Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On March 2, 2022 in the House:
- Executive Session Completed
- Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight
- HCS Voted Do Pass
- HCS Reported Do Pass - AYES: 4 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 1
On February 28, 2022 in the House:
- Action Postponed
On February 22, 2022 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On January 27, 2022 in the House:
- Referred: Special Committee on Public Policy
On January 20, 2022 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 19, 2022 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Amendments (8)
3987S14.24S
Offered
3987S14.22S
Offered
3987S.14F
Offered
3987H05.10H
Distributed
3987H05.09H
Adopted
3987H05.08H
Distributed
3987H05.06H
Adopted
3987H05.05H
Substitute