+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On February 13, 2007 in the House:
- Executive Session Completed
- Voted Do Pass
On February 6, 2007 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On January 25, 2007 in the House:
- Referred: Higher Education
On January 8, 2007 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 4, 2007 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor