+ − Actions (20)
On May 16, 2001 in the Senate:
- Placed on Informal Calendar
- Reported Do Pass
- Executive Session Held
- Public Hearing Held
On May 11, 2001 in the Senate:
- Referred: Budget Control Committee
On May 10, 2001 in the Senate:
- SCS Reported Do Pass
On April 24, 2001 in the Senate:
- Executive Session Held - COMMITTEE VOTE RECONSIDERED/SCS VOTED DO PASS
On April 11, 2001 in the Senate:
- Executive Session Held - VOTED DO NOT PASS
On April 9, 2001 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Held
On April 5, 2001 in the House:
- Second Rd/Refer: Fin & Govt Org, Vet Affairs & Elections
On March 15, 2001 in the Senate:
- Reported to the Senate and First Read
On March 15, 2001 in the House:
- Third Read and Passed - AYES: 117 NOES: 032
On March 13, 2001 in the House:
- Reported Perfected and Printed
On March 12, 2001 in the House:
- Perfected
On February 26, 2001 in the House:
- Reported Do Pass
On February 21, 2001 in the House:
- Executive Session Completed - VOTED DO PASS
On February 14, 2001 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On January 29, 2001 in the House:
- Referred: Professional Registration and Licensing
On January 4, 2001 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 3, 2001 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor