+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On April 18, 2016 in the House:
- HCS Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On April 6, 2016 in the House:
- Referred: Select Committee on Social Services
- Reported Do Pass with Amendments - HCA 1 AYES: 10 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
- Voted Do Pass with Amendments
- Executive Session Completed
On March 16, 2016 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On March 10, 2016 in the House:
- Referred: Health and Mental Health Policy
On February 8, 2016 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On February 4, 2016 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Amendment
6238H01.03H
Committee
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor