+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (36)
On April 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass
On April 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Executive Session Held - Voted do pass
- Public Hearing Held
On April 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Scheduled - Monday, April 24, 2017, 3:00 p.m., Bingham Conference Room
- Hearing Cancelled - Hearing rescheduled
On April 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Executive Session Scheduled - Friday, April 21, 2017, 8:00am, Bingham Conference Room
On April 18, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred: Senate Fiscal Oversight
On April 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- SCS Reported Do Pass
On April 11, 2017 in the Senate:
- Executive Session Held - SCS voted do pass
On April 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Executive Session Scheduled - Tuesday, April 11, 2017, 12:00pm, SCR 1
On April 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Held
On March 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Scheduled - Tuesday, April 4, 2017, SCR 1
On March 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Second read and referred: Senate Education
On March 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported to the Senate and First Read
On March 13, 2017 in the House:
- Third Read and Passed - AYES: 149 NOES: 4 PRESENT: 0
- Taken Up
On March 9, 2017 in the House:
- Executive Session Completed
- Voted Do Pass
- Reported Do Pass - AYES: 11 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0
On March 7, 2017 in the House:
- Referred: Fiscal Review
On March 6, 2017 in the House:
- Perfected
- Title of Bill - Agreed To
- Taken Up
On February 23, 2017 in the House:
- Reported Do Pass - AYES: 13 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
On February 22, 2017 in the House:
- Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On February 8, 2017 in the House:
- Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight
- Reported Do Pass - AYES: 12 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 1
On February 6, 2017 in the House:
- Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On January 30, 2017 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On January 23, 2017 in the House:
- Public Hearing Scheduled, Bill not Heard
On January 12, 2017 in the House:
- Referred: Elementary and Secondary Education
On January 5, 2017 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 4, 2017 in the House:
- Read First Time
On December 19, 2016 in the House:
- Prefiled