+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On May 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Scheduled
- Public Hearing Held
On May 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- Second read and referred: Senate Transportation, Infrastructure, and Public Safety
On May 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reported to the Senate and First Read
On April 28, 2016 in the House:
- Taken Up
- Third Read and Passed - AYES: 126 NOES: 9 PRESENT: 0
On April 26, 2016 in the House:
- Taken Up
- Perfected with Amendments - HCA1 adopted
On March 8, 2016 in the House:
- Reported Do Pass with Amendments - HCA 1 AYES: 7 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
On March 2, 2016 in the House:
- Executive Session Completed
- Voted Do Pass with Amendments
On February 29, 2016 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On February 10, 2016 in the House:
- Referred: Government Oversight and Accountability
On February 4, 2016 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On February 3, 2016 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Amendments (5)
6265H01.16H
Distributed
6265H01.10H
Committee
6265H01.13H
Distributed
6265H01.14H
Distributed
6265H01.15H
Distributed