+ − Summaries (6)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (30)
On July 9, 2009 in the House:
- Delivered to Secretary of State
- Approved by Governor
On May 29, 2009 in the House:
- Delivered to Governor
On May 29, 2009 in the Senate:
- Signed by President Pro Tem
On May 29, 2009 in the House:
- Signed by House Speaker
On May 5, 2009 in the House:
- Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed - AYES: 154 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 1
- House Concurs - SS ADOPTED AYES: 154 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 1
On April 27, 2009 in the House:
- Reported to the House with... - SS
On April 27, 2009 in the Senate:
- Third Read and Passed - YEAS: 33 NAYS: 0
- SS Adopted
- Senate Substitute Offered
On April 23, 2009 in the Senate:
- SCS Reported Do Pass
On April 14, 2009 in the Senate:
- Executive Session Held - SCS VOTED DO PASS
On April 7, 2009 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Held
On April 1, 2009 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Scheduled - TUESDAY, APRIL 7, 2009, 8:15A.M. SENATE COMMITTEE ROOM 1
On March 26, 2009 in the Senate:
- Second Read and Referred: Health, Mental Health, Seniors, and Families
On March 12, 2009 in the Senate:
- Reported to the Senate and First Read
On March 12, 2009 in the House:
- Third Read and Passed - AYES: 157 NOES: 0
On March 10, 2009 in the House:
- Perfected by Consent - Pursuant to House Rules
On March 3, 2009 in the House:
- Rules - Reported Do Pass - Consent
- Rules - Voted Do Pass - Consent
- Rules - Executive Session Completed
On February 17, 2009 in the House:
- Referred: Rules - Pursuant to Rule 25
- HCS Reported Do Pass by Consent
- HCS Voted Do Pass - Consent
- Executive Session Completed
On February 10, 2009 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On January 22, 2009 in the House:
- Referred: Higher Education
On January 13, 2009 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 12, 2009 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor