+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On April 10, 2008 in the House:
- HCS Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On April 9, 2008 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On April 3, 2008 in the House:
- Referred: Special Committee on Utilities
On March 27, 2008 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On March 26, 2008 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor