+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (30)
On May 6, 2022 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass
- Executive Session Held
- Voted Do Pass
On May 5, 2022 in the Senate:
- Executive Session Scheduled - Friday, May 6, 2022, 9:00 a.m., Senate Committee Room 2.
- Referred: Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight
On May 4, 2022 in the Senate:
- SCS Reported Do Pass
On April 28, 2022 in the Senate:
- SCS Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Held
On April 20, 2022 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Held
On April 14, 2022 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Scheduled - Wednesday, April 20, 2022, 9:00 a.m., Senate Committee Room 1.
On March 31, 2022 in the Senate:
- Second read and referred: Seniors, Families, Veterans and Military Affairs
On March 29, 2022 in the Senate:
- Reported to the Senate and First Read
On March 29, 2022 in the House:
- Third Read and Passed - AYES: 149 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
- Taken Up for Third Reading
On March 28, 2022 in the House:
- Placed on the Informal Third Reading Calendar
On March 23, 2022 in the House:
- Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar
- Perfected
- Taken Up for Perfection
- Title of Bill - Agreed To
On March 10, 2022 in the House:
- Reported Do Pass - AYES: 9 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
On March 9, 2022 in the House:
- Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On February 16, 2022 in the House:
- Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight
- Reported Do Pass - AYES: 12 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
On February 15, 2022 in the House:
- Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On February 8, 2022 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On February 1, 2022 in the House:
- Referred: Veterans
On January 19, 2022 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 18, 2022 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor